Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santos Moro Briz

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ávila, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1888Born
16 Jul 191123.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ávila, Spain
21 Jun 193547.0AppointedBishop of Ávila, Spain
22 Sep 193547.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ávila, Spain
19 Oct 196880.3RetiredBishop of Ávila, Spain
19 Oct 196880.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
11 Dec 197082.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Hierpiniana
24 May 198091.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Ávila, Spain

MicroData Summary
Santos Moro Briz
Bishop Santos Moro Briz
(born , died )
Bishop Emeritus of Ávila

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantibańez de Bejar, Diocese of Ávila
Ordained BishopTransfiguración, Cathedral, Ávila, Diocese of Ávila
Death PlaceÁvila, Diocese of Ávila

  • a priest for 68.8 years
  • a bishop for 44.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1935, Number 73
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025