Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Msakila

Deceased

Bishop of Sumbawanga, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1919Born
31 Aug 194727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Karema, Tanzania
13 Nov 195839.0AppointedBishop of Karema, Tanzania
27 Dec 195839.1Ordained BishopBishop of Karema, Tanzania
23 Feb 199474.2DiedBishop of Sumbawanga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary
Charles Msakila
Bishop Charles Msakila
(born , died )
Bishop of Sumbawanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKarema, Vicariate Apostolic of Karema
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1958, Number 106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025