Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
7 Sep 1976 | Born | ||
9 Jun 2007 | 30.7 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Ratchaburi, Thailand |
8 Jul 2024 | 47.8 | Appointed | Bishop of Surat Thani, Thailand |
28 Sep 2024 | 48.0 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Surat Thani, Thailand |
(WikiData: Q127268776)
Father
Paul Trairong
Multree
(born )
Bishop-Elect
of Surat Thani
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Khon Kaen |
Ordained Bishop | St. Raphael, Cathedral, Surat Thani, Diocese of Surat Thani |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 15 Aug 2024 |
✠