Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
3 Apr 1964 | Born | ||
1 Aug 1993 | 29.3 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Kigali, Rwanda |
12 Aug 2024 | 60.3 | Appointed | Bishop of Butare, Rwanda |
5 Oct 2024 | 60.5 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Butare, Rwanda |
(WikiData: Q128934024)
Father
Jean Bosco
Ntagungira
(born )
Bishop-Elect
of Butare
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Kigali, Archdiocese of Kabgayi |
Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Butare.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 6 Sep 2024 |
✠