Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Pak Sok-hi

Deceased

Bishop of Andong, Korea (South)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1941Born
23 Oct 197130.5Ordained PriestPriest of Daegu {Taegu}, Korea (South)
6 Oct 199049.5AppointedBishop of Andong, Korea (South)
2 Dec 199049.7Ordained BishopBishop of Andong, Korea (South)
9 Oct 200059.5DiedBishop of Andong, Korea (South)

MicroData Summary
Ignatius Pak Sok-hi
Bishop Ignatius Pak Sok-hi
(born , died )
Bishop of Andong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJangsan-ri, Wolhang-myeon, Seongju-gun, Vicariate Apostolic of Taiku
Ordained PriestCathedral, Daegu, Archdiocese of Daegu {Taegu}
Ordained BishopImmaculate Conception, Cathedral, Andong, Diocese of Andong
Death PlaceJuwangsan Mountain, Archdiocese of Daegu {Taegu}

  • a priest for 28.9 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,293
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,433
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • opd/loc: CB, 15 Apr 2025

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 15 Apr 2025