Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Baptiste Cardinal Phạm Minh Mẫn

Archbishop Emeritus of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam

Cardinal-Priest of San Giustino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 193491.15 Born
25 May 196531.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cần Thơ, Viet Nam
22 Mar 199359.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
11 Aug 199359.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
1 Mar 199863.9AppointedArchbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
21 Oct 200369.6Elevated to Cardinal
21 Oct 200369.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Giustino
23 Nov 200369.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giustino
22 Mar 201480.0RetiredArchbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam

MicroData Summary
Jean-Baptiste Phạm Minh Mẫn
Jean-Baptiste Cardinal Phạm Minh Mẫn
(born )
Archbishop Emeritus of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCa Mau, Vicariate Apostolic of Phnom-Penh, Cambodia
Ordained BishopGrand, Seminary, Cần Thơ, Diocese of Cần Thơ

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville).

  • a priest for 59.93 years
  • a bishop for 31.72 years
  • a cardinal for 21.53 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • bd: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,295
  • bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025