Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rubén Cardinal Salazar Gómez

Archbishop Emeritus of Bogotá, Colombia

Cardinal-Priest of San Gerardo Maiella


Motto: Tunc Dixi Ecce Venio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 194282.61 Born
20 May 196724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ibagué, Colombia
11 Feb 199249.3AppointedBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
25 Mar 199249.5Ordained BishopBishop of Cúcuta, Colombia
18 Mar 199956.4AppointedArchbishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
8 Jul 201067.7AppointedArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
13 Aug 201067.8InstalledArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
24 Nov 201270.1Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 201270.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gerardo Maiella
28 Apr 201370.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Gerardo Maiella
25 Apr 202077.5RetiredArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia

MicroData Summary
Rubén Salazar Gómez
Rubén Cardinal Salazar Gómez
(born )
Archbishop Emeritus of Bogotá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá, Archdiocese of Bogotá
Ordained BishopIbagué, Archdiocese of Ibagué

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Bogotá.

  • a priest for 57.95 years
  • a bishop for 33.10 years
  • a cardinal for 12.43 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,916
  • card: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2012
  • i: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2013
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025