Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
25 Feb 1973 | Born | ||
1 Jul 2001 | 28.3 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Congregation of the Mission |
16 Jul 2024 | 51.3 | Appointed | Vicar Apostolic of Nekemte, Ethiopia |
22 Sep 2024 | 51.5 | Ordained Bishop | Vicar Apostolic of Nekemte, Ethiopia |
(WikiData: Q127503206)
Father
Getahun Fanta
Shikune
C.M.
(born )
Vicar Apostolic
of Nekemte
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Aleku Sassi, West Wollega, Vicariate Apostolic of Gimma |
Ordained Bishop | Kidane Mihert, Cathedral, Nekemte, Vicariate Apostolic of Nekemte |
Please contact the Father through the Vicariate Apostolic of Nekemte.
|
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries | Religious
Men
Women |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.7, 30 Jun 2024; Data: 14 Aug 2024 |
✠