Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
30 Jun 1971 | Born | ||
14 Dec 1996 | 25.4 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Montréal, Québec, Canada |
16 Jul 2022 | 51.0 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada |
16 Jul 2022 | 51.0 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Tamada |
12 Sep 2022 | 51.2 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Tamada |
11 Feb 2023 | 51.6 | Appointed | Archbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada |
25 Mar 2023 | 51.7 | Installed | Archbishop of Toronto, Ontario, Canada |
(WikiData: Q113122506)
Archbishop
Francis
Leo
(born )
Archbishop
of Toronto
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec |
Ordained Bishop | Marie-Reine-du-Monde, Cathedral Basilica, Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.6, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 1 May 2024 |
✠