Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
29 Jan 1967 | Born | ||
13 Jun 1992 | 25.3 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Torino {Turin}, Italy |
19 Feb 2022 | 55.0 | Appointed | Archbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy |
19 Feb 2022 | 55.0 | Appointed | Archbishop (Personal Title) of Susa, Italy |
7 May 2022 | 55.2 | Ordained Bishop | Archbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy |
8 May 2022 | 55.2 | Installed | Bishop of Susa, Italy |
(VIAF: 42116076; WikiData: Q80976380)
Archbishop
Roberto
Repole
(born )
Archbishop
of Torino {Turin}
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin} |
Ordained Bishop | In Front of, San Giovanni Battista, Cathedral, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin} |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠